Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lambert-Davda, Dallas Sarah, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Louie, Chad A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLouie, Chad A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship Of The Person And Estate - Relative |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Ruling
Date: January 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Family Court Services Investigator's Report HRG DATE 07/28/2022HRG DATE 07/28/2022 |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Family Court Services Investigator's Report HRG DATE 07/28/2022HRG DATE 07/28/2022 |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition to Appoint Temporary Guardian READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE COMMENTS- The declaration of Petitioner filed with the petition for appointment of temporary guardian is missing Exhibits 1 9, although referenced in the declaration. 02/09/22 CALENDAR #01 Judge: Louie, Chad A. |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian NOT READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE SAME NOTES- 1. Need FCS report. ***NOTE #02 PERTAINS TO OBJECTIONS FILED 09/21/21 BY MOTHER*** 2. Need proof of service to minor's counsel, Sarah Vizzard. 02/09/22 CALENDAR #02 Judge: Louie, Chad A. |
|
February 09, 2022 | Hearing |
Petition to Appoint Temporary Guardian READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE COMMENTS- The declaration of Petitioner filed with the petition for appointment of temporary guardian is missing Exhibits 1 9, although referenced in the declaration. 02/09/22 CALENDAR #01 Judge: Louie, Chad A. |
|
February 09, 2022 | Hearing |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian NOT READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE SAME NOTES- 1. Need FCS report. ***NOTE #02 PERTAINS TO OBJECTIONS FILED 09/21/21 BY MOTHER*** 2. Need proof of service to minor's counsel, Sarah Vizzard. 02/09/22 CALENDAR #02 Judge: Louie, Chad A. |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Family Court Services - Request for Continuance HRG DATE 02/09/2022HRG DATE 02/09/2022 |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Family Court Services - Request for Continuance HRG DATE 02/09/2022 |
|
January 31, 2022 | Hearing |
Family Court Services - Request for Continuance HRG DATE 02/09/2022 |
|
January 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Family Court Services - Request for Continuance HRG DATE 02/09/2022HRG DATE 02/09/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.