Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Villa, Olivia, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Andrew Kendall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrew Kendall Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship Of The Person Only - Relative |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON | |
August 02, 2021 | Hearing | Petition for Appointment of Guardian | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Confidential Guardian Screening Form is missing information or Attachment for number 8. Need to provide CONFIDENTIAL verified supplement for number 8. 2. Notice of Hearing filed 07/28/21 is missing page 2 of GC-020. The GC-020(P), Proof of Personal Service of Notice of Hearing is an attachment in addition to Notice of Hearing. Need to file the complete 2 page Notice of Hearing (GC-020) and its attachment. 3. Need proof of mailing to paternal grandmother, Maria Teresa Montoya Ordundo Lopez. 4. Need Family Court Services 1513(a) report. 5. Notice of Hearing filed 07/28/21 is missing page 2 of the Notice of Hearing form (GC-020). Must file the complete mandatory judicial council form (pages 1 - 2) in addition to any attachments to the form used. Judge: Stein, Cameryn |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Probate Code 1513(a) investigation by Family Court Services. Judge: Stein, Cameryn |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
A portion or all of the proceedings in this case were not audio streamed due to containing confidential matters. |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Court Services Supplemental Investigator's Report HRG: 08/02/21 |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Court Services Investigator's Report HRG: 08/02/21 |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Department of Human Services Letter Received | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Letters of Guardian |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.