Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Schultz, Deanna, Schultz, Jon, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Andrew Kendall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrew Kendall Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship Of The Person Only - Relative |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2021 | Hearing | Audio streaming announced. | |
September 21, 2021 | Hearing |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAM NOTE - 1. Need Family Court Services Report. Judge: Kendall, Andrew |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAM NOTE - 1. Need Family Court Services Report. Judge: Kendall, Andrew |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | petition for appointment of guardian of the person | |
September 20, 2021 | Hearing |
Family Court Services Investigator's Report HRG DATE 09/20/2021 |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Court Services Investigator's Report HRG DATE 09/20/2021 |
|
September 13, 2021 | Hearing |
Family Court Services Supplemental Investigator's Report HRG DATE 09/21/2021 |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Court Services Supplemental Investigator's Report HRG DATE 09/21/2021 |
|
July 23, 2021 | Hearing |
Consent Nomination and Waiver Father's consent and nomination |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Consent Nomination and Waiver Father's consent and nomination |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.