Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Thomas Jamie, Lestelle Maureen, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Mitchell L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMitchell L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2011 |
CategoryConservatorship (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time3417 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice (Notice of Entry of Order ) Filed by Conservatee |
|
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event | TERM: Approval Final Acctng Cons/Gdn w/No Succr Apptd E/P&E | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Receipt (Receipt for Ctor Fees - Gina ) Filed by Conservator |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order Filed by Attorney |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Receipt (Receipt for Ctor Fees - Maureen ) Filed by Conservator |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Receipt (Receipt for Attorney's Fees ) Filed by Conservator |
|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Order - Terminating Conservatorship | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held Judge: Michael |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition Granted (Account - Final or Waiver filed on March 9, 2020 by Gina Mondello. ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.