Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Webb, Sasha Rae, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Weaver, Charleston, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Green, Kenneth R., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGreen, Kenneth R., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 06/15/21 PET DV/TRO MOVE OUT C CV 4 MINORS CONT FROM 06/30/21 STATUS RESP VISITATION ONLY Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 06/15/21 PET DV/TRO MOVE OUT C CV 4 MINORS CONT FROM 06/30/21 STATUS RESP VISITATION ONLY Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
July 02, 2021 | Hearing |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS
Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
June 30, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 6/15/2021 PET DV/TRO MOVE OUT C/C C/V 4 MINORS Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 6/15/2021 PET DV/TRO MOVE OUT C/C C/V 4 MINORS Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
June 29, 2021 | Hearing |
Mediation Appointment SET BY PET |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mediation Appointment SET BY PET |
|
June 23, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Personal Service | |
June 15, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109) | |
June 15, 2021 | Hearing | Temporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.