Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ayon Nunez, Edith, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Ayon, Marcos, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Green, Kenneth R., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGreen, Kenneth R., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2021 | Hearing | Audio streaming announced. | |
April 07, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 3/18/21 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V 3 MINORS Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 3/18/21 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V 3 MINORS Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
April 06, 2021 | Hearing |
Mediation Appointment SET BY PET |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mediation Appointment SET BY PET |
|
March 30, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Personal Service | |
March 24, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Personal Service | |
March 18, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109) | |
March 18, 2021 | Hearing | Temporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New) | |
March 17, 2021 | Hearing |
Request for DV Restraining Order New With Children E-FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.