Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Benitez, Aaron, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Valenzuela, Elizabeth Renee, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Webster, Jason W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWebster, Jason W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: April 27, 2021Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: February 16, 2022Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: October 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2022 | Hearing |
Short Cause Court Trial < 5hrs 12/02/21 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 2 MINORS Remaining issues : c/c, property division Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Short Cause Court Trial < 5hrs 12/02/21 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 2 MINORS Remaining issues : c/c, property division Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
February 24, 2022 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference 12/02/21 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 2 MINORS issues: c/c, property division Trial date set 03/11/22 DIV C *all pre/final dod filed Judge: Griffith, Donald B. |
|
February 24, 2022 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference *MATTER TO BE HEARD IN DIVSION G Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference 12/02/21 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 2 MINORS issues: c/c, property division Trial date set 03/11/22 DIV C *all pre/final dod filed Judge: Griffith, Donald B. |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference *MATTER TO BE HEARD IN DIVSION G Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
February 24, 2022 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference 12/02/21 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 2 MINORS issues: c/c, property division Trial date set 03/11/22 Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference 12/02/21 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 2 MINORS issues: c/c, property division Trial date set 03/11/22 Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
February 17, 2022 | Hearing |
Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference MSC AND TRIAL NOTICE |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference MSC AND TRIAL NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.