Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chamberlain, Athena, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Chamberlain, Nathaniel, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Green, Kenneth R., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGreen, Kenneth R., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2021 | Hearing |
Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw 09/22/21 RES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw 09/22/21 RES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
September 22, 2021 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion E-FILED |
|
September 22, 2021 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice MOTION TO BE RELIEVED ENV#7278958 |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion E-FILED |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice MOTION TO BE RELIEVED ENV#7278958 |
|
July 23, 2021 | Hearing |
Findings and Orders
Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
July 16, 2021 | Hearing |
Findings and Orders CCP 635 Judge: Cannon, Gloria |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders CCP 635 Judge: Cannon, Gloria |
|
June 23, 2021 | Hearing |
Miscellaneous Filing MINUTE ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.