Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wilson, Piper S, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Wilson, Michelle Renee Hatton, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Green, Kenneth R., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGreen, Kenneth R., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2021 | Hearing | Dismissal - Lack of Prosecution Before Hearing | |
April 07, 2021 | Hearing | Audio streaming announced. | |
April 07, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 3/12/2021 PET DV/TRO Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 3/12/2021 PET DV/TRO Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
April 05, 2021 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys RESPONDENTS Substitution of Attorneys |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys RESPONDENTS Substitution of Attorneys |
|
March 18, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Personal Service | |
March 12, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109) | |
March 12, 2021 | Hearing |
Temporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New)
Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
March 12, 2021 | Hearing | Request for DV Restraining Order New No Children |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.