Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Munoz, Elizabeth, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Ramirez-Billi, Francisco, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Marquez, Raymonda B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarquez, Raymonda B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 11, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2021 | Hearing |
Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw 5/25/2021 NOM TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ATTY REBECA GONZALEZ Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw 5/25/2021 NOM TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ATTY REBECA GONZALEZ Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
May 25, 2021 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion Re: NOM & MOTION TO BE RELIEVES AS COUNSEL Hearing Date: Hearing Time: Hearing Department/Division: |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Re: NOM & MOTION TO BE RELIEVES AS COUNSEL Hearing Date: Hearing Time: Hearing Department/Division: |
|
April 12, 2021 | Hearing |
Findings and Orders HRG 4/8/2021 Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders HRG 4/8/2021 Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
April 08, 2021 | Hearing |
Mediation Agreement and Order
Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
April 08, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence PET DV/TRO C/C C/V 3-MINORS Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence PET DV/TRO C/C C/V 3-MINORS Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
April 07, 2021 | Hearing |
Mediation Appointment DV/TRO SET BY PETITIONER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.