Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Heade, Noreen, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Heade, Bryan, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Cannon, Gloria presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCannon, Gloria Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMay 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration HRG 4/4/2022HRG 4/4/2022 |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys Former Attorney: New Attorney:Former Attorney: New Attorney: |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Change Name/Address | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service HRG 4/4/22HRG 4/4/22 |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Order (FL-300) MOD SS, PROPERTY CONTROL, DV PROPERT RETURNMOD SS, PROPERTY CONTROL, DV PROPERT RETURN |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS EXP 07/27/2024EXP 07/27/2024 |
|
July 27, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 03/10/21 PET DV/TRO MOVE OUT PROP CNTRL/RSTRNT CONT FROM 03/30/21 5/4/21 5/25/21 Judge: Cannon, Gloria |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 03/10/21 PET DV/TRO MOVE OUT PROP CNTRL/RSTRNT CONT FROM 03/30/21 5/4/21 5/25/21 Judge: Cannon, Gloria |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.