Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Canas, Antonio, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Canas, Lorena, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Marquez, Raymonda B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarquez, Raymonda B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2021 | Hearing |
Family Centered Case Resolution CONTD 1/20/21 Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Centered Case Resolution CONTD 1/20/21 Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
January 20, 2021 | Hearing |
Family Centered Case Resolution 12/9/2020 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR MINORS **TO BE HEARD FOR JUDGMENT** Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Centered Case Resolution 12/9/2020 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR MINORS **TO BE HEARD FOR JUDGMENT** Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
January 14, 2021 | Hearing | Document Voided Pursuant to GC 68634 (g). | |
December 09, 2020 | Hearing |
Notice of Hearing FCCR HRG: DIV: |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing FCCR HRG: DIV: |
|
December 04, 2020 | Hearing | At-Issue Memorandum | |
November 06, 2020 | Hearing |
Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted - Partial Payment 75% Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
November 06, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Waiver of Fees RES FW FEES: $435.00 Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.