Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Salazar, Pamela Rodriguez, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Davis, Tracy Lee, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Green, Kenneth R., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGreen, Kenneth R., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 30, 2018 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 10, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 10, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 5/30/18 PET DVTRO C/C C/V 1 MINOR CONTD 1/20/21 3/04/21 8/19/21 9/30/21 12/02/21 *STATUS OF RESP CRIMINAL MATTER* Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
January 20, 2022 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 5/30/18 PET DVTRO C/C C/V 1 MINOR CONTD 1/20/21 3/04/21 8/19/21 9/30/21 12/02/21 *STATUS OF RESP CRIMINAL MATTER* Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
January 11, 2022 | Hearing | Audio streaming announced. | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw 12/13/21 PET NOM TO BE RELIEVED ATTY GEORGE HORRIGAN Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
January 11, 2022 | Hearing |
Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw 12/13/21 PET NOM TO BE RELIEVED ATTY GEORGE HORRIGAN Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion E-FILED |
|
December 13, 2021 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion E-FILED |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice NOM AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED ENV#7812891 |
|
December 10, 2021 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice NOM AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED ENV#7812891 |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.