Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Morgan Greg A., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Curtin Richard P., against Morgan Kathleen A., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Steff R. Padilla presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteff R. Padilla Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions415 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time561 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (RESP'S - Signed on 2010-04-08 ) | |
April 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (RESP'S - Signed on 2010-04-08 ) | |
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment - Reserved Issues - Contested (- Signed on 2010-04-01 ) | |
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment | |
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment - Reserved Issues - Contested (- Signed on 2010-04-01 ) | |
April 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 6, Padilla, Steff, Presiding Short Cause Trial - Held - Trial Continued Short Cause Trial - Held - Trial Continued Judge: Padilla Steff |
|
April 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
at 1:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 6, Padilla, Steff, Presiding Short Cause Trial - Held - Trial Continued Judge: Steff |
|
April 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration - Income and Expense (pet's ) | |
April 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration - Income and Expense (pet's ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.