Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Palomares, Luisa, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Rodriguez, Connie A, against Reading International, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarmann, Bernard C., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2021 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: February 18, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: May 04, 2022Order to Show Cause
Date: November 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | 54. Pltf's Ntc of Settlement | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | 42. Pltf's MSC Stmt | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | MSC | |
May 04, 2022 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendants' Notice of Posting Jury Fees | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Def Consolidated Ent. Answer to Complaint | |
February 18, 2022 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/18/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: H |
|
November 08, 2021 | Hearing |
Summons Issued and Filed Returned via E-File |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.