Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Montoya, Lydia, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Cara, Anthony P., against Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc, U.S. Bank National Association, As Indenture Trustee, For The Holders Of The Cim Trust 2021-Nr1, Mortgage-Backed Notes, Series 2021-Nr1, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarmann, Bernard C., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2021 |
Category26-Cv Other Real Property-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Order to Show Cause
Date: October 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2022 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
February 03, 2022 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/03/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 10 |
|
October 22, 2021 | Hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
October 22, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/03/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 10 |
|
October 21, 2021 | Hearing | Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) | |
October 21, 2021 | Hearing | Summons Issued and Filed | |
October 21, 2021 | Hearing | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.