Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wingo, Timberly, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Feely, John Conrad, against Subaru Of America, Inc., A Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 20, 2021 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Order to Show Cause
Date: October 21, 20212022_03_18_Wingo_Notice_of_Jury_Fees
Date: March 18, 20222022_04_19_Wingo_CMC_Statement
Date: March 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023_02_03_Request_for_Dismissal_Wingo | |
April 19, 2022 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022.04.11 Further Updated CMC Statement | |
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022.03.31 NOPJF | |
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022.03.31 CMC Statement | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022_04_19_Wingo_CMC_Statement_2 | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022_03_18_Wingo_Notice_of_Jury_Fees | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022_04_19_Wingo_CMC_Statement | |
February 03, 2022 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/03/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.