Case Last Refreshed: 15 hours ago
Alvarez, Katrina, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Rothman, Ben, against Kim, Sejin, Sk Ventures, Llc, represented by Godinez, Gabriel A, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Clark, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 18, 2021 |
Category15-Cv Other Employment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Final Case Management Conference
Date: March 12, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: April 18, 2022Final Case Management Conference
Date: March 11, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Regular 3/22/2024 due 3/27/2024 Defendant's Counsel Motion to be relieved Amy 661-302-4949 |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference TO RE-SET FINAL CMC AND JURY TRIAL |
|
April 17, 2024 | Hearing |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Regular 3/22/2024 due 3/27/2024 Defendant's Counsel Motion to be relieved Amy 661-302-4949 Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
April 17, 2024 | Hearing |
Trial Setting Conference TO RE-SET FINAL CMC AND JURY TRIAL Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | KIM POS | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | KIM PRO | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | KIM DECL | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | KIM MOTION | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | SK POS | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | SK PRO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.