Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Vida Bem, Llc, A Nevada Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Braun, Craig D, against Agritec International Ltd., A Wisconsin Corporation, Doing Business In California As Cleantech Environmental, Inc., represented by Frank, Michael F, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarmann, Bernard C., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 19, 2021 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Order to Show Cause
Date: October 20, 2021Objections_to_Declaration_of_Robert_Brown_III
Date: January 21, 2022Proposed_Order_on_Object_of_Robert_Brown_III
Date: January 21, 2022Reply_Memorandum_of_Poin_e_Writ_of_Attachment
Date: January 21, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 20, 2021Ruling
Date: January 24, 2022Application (Pre-Disposition)
Date: January 25, 2022Notice_of_Settlement_of_Entire_Case
Date: February 25, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: March 01, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 28, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2022 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice_of_Settlement_of_Entire_Case | |
February 02, 2022 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application (Pre-Disposition) 01/25/2022 Application (Pre-Disposition) for Right to Attach Order and Temporary Restraining Order: as to Defendant, Agritec International, LTD dba in California as Cleantech Environmental,INC *** TO BE HEARD IN DEPT. 17 FOR HEARING ONLY *** Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
January 25, 2022 | Hearing |
Application (Pre-Disposition) for Right to Attach Order and Temporary Restraining Order: as to Defendant, Agritec International, LTD dba in California as Cleantech Environmental,INC *** TO BE HEARD IN DEPT. 17 FOR HEARING ONLY *** Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ruling 01/24/2022 Ruling re: Application for Right to Attach |
|
January 24, 2022 | Hearing |
Ruling re: Application for Right to Attach |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Objections_to_Declaration_of_Robert_Brown_III | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed_Order_on_Object_of_Robert_Brown_III |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.