Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rosiles, Daniel, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Kokozian, Bruce Z., against Arredondo Automotive Group, Inc., A California Corporation, represented by Feher, Thomas P, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
Category15-Cv Other Employment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Order to Show Cause
Date: August 25, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Date: February 07, 2022NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES
Date: February 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal (00618187xDA2F4) | |
December 05, 2022 | Hearing |
Jury Trial estimate 7 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
December 05, 2022 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial estimate 7 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE | |
February 22, 2022 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of posting jury fees (00526623xDA2F4) | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement (CMC 2-22-22) (00526652xDA2F4) | |
February 17, 2022 | Hearing | Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.