Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Powell, David, Powell, Silvia, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Fogel, Benjamin, against Dignity Health, Dignity Health - Mercy Hospital Of Bakersfield, A California Corporation, Nehal Patel, Rph, Ugoh, Chioma O., M.D., represented by Pluma, Gillian N, Thelen, Kevin E, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Bradshaw, J. Eric presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBradshaw, J. Eric Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 22, 2021 |
Category45-Cv Medical Malpractice - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
This complaint is a summons document returned by the Clerk of the Superior Court to Attorney Benjamin Fogel in the case of Powell et al vs. Ugoh, M.D. et al. The document states that the attached papers are being returned for various reasons, includi...
Order to Show Cause
Date: August 24, 202152623CaseM006804
Date: January 27, 202252755CaseM00eaf2
Date: January 31, 202252678Notic006b13
Date: January 28, 2022(2-22-22) Case Management Statement by Defendant Chioma O. Ugoh M.D. (00523286xDA2F4)
Date: February 08, 2022Notice of Posting Jury Fees by Defendant Chioma O. Ugoh M.D. (00523283xDA2F4)
Date: February 08, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: August 24, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 26, 2022Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: January 27, 202259440Proof004446
Date: June 23, 202263718Assoc0070c5
Date: September 20, 202265910Notic02b5af
Date: November 03, 202265910APPLI00c47e
Date: November 03, 202265910PROPO0317e1
Date: November 03, 202265910Notic01571a
Date: November 03, 202267851Notic00d534
Date: December 14, 2022Request for Dismissal of Entire Action (00621118xDA2F4)
Date: December 27, 202269522Reque00b673
Date: January 19, 202369522Reque01d73d
Date: January 19, 202370614Notic00acd0
Date: February 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | 70614Notic00acd0 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | 69522Reque00b673 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | 69522Reque01d73d | |
January 17, 2023 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E 12 DAYS JURY FOR ALL PARTIES |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial T/E 12 DAYS JURY FOR ALL PARTIES |
|
January 13, 2023 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference J/T SET 1/17/23 930AM DIV J T/E 12 DAYS JURY FOR ALL PARTIES Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference J/T SET 1/17/23 930AM DIV J T/E 12 DAYS JURY FOR ALL PARTIES Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Entire Action (00621118xDA2F4) | |
December 16, 2022 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference J/T SET 1/17/23 930AM DIV J T/E 12 DAYS AND FSC SET 1/13/23 130PM DIV J Judge: Brehmer, Charles R. |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference J/T SET 1/17/23 930AM DIV J T/E 12 DAYS AND FSC SET 1/13/23 130PM DIV J Judge: Brehmer, Charles R. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.