Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc., A Washington Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Iezza, Nick I, against Chavis, Christian, Porter, Darlene, Tender Hands Residential Care Inc., A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarmann, Bernard C., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 22, 2021 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Application (Pre-Disposition)
Date: October 13, 2021Application (Pre-Disposition)
Date: November 30, 2021Application (Pre-Disposition)
Date: October 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Regular 3/26/24 due: 3/29/24; Plaintiff's Debtor's Exam as to both defendants; contact: Ariana 805-777-1175 |
|
June 21, 2024 | Hearing |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Regular 3/26/24 due: 3/29/24; Plaintiff's Debtor's Exam as to both defendants; contact: Ariana 805-777-1175 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | ORAP 314.1158 | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Darlene Porter | |
March 28, 2024 | Hearing | Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Darlene Porter | |
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Number Electronic Rejection Notice TO: Nick I Iezza, Esq. RE: Request to Continue Judgment Debtor's Examination REASON: The [proposed] Order was incorrectly attached to the Request Document. The [proposed] Order had a separate cover page, therefore, it should be filed as a second document. The Court does not separate incorrectly attached documents. Documents with their own cover page should be separately submitted. If a [proposed] Order is considered part of the lead document, then incorporate it as part of that document and do not give it its own cover page. |
|
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Number Debtor's Examination Order Signed 11/6/2023, Application and Order For Appearance and Examination as to Darlene Porter (Plaintiff Reserved: 10/24/23, Contact: Alanna Padilla (805) 777-1175) |
|
January 10, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice TO: Nick I Iezza, Esq. RE: Request to Continue Judgment Debtor's Examination REASON: The [proposed] Order was incorrectly attached to the Request Document. The [proposed] Order had a separate cover page, therefore, it should be filed as a second document. The Court does not separate incorrectly attached documents. Documents with their own cover page should be separately submitted. If a [proposed] Order is considered part of the lead document, then incorporate it as part of that document and do not give it its own cover page. |
|
January 10, 2024 | Hearing |
Debtor's Examination Order Signed 11/6/2023, Application and Order For Appearance and Examination as to Darlene Porter (Plaintiff Reserved: 10/24/23, Contact: Alanna Padilla (805) 777-1175) Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
January 10, 2024 | Hearing |
Debtor's Examination Plaintiff, Reserved 10/24/23 due by 10/27/23,Contact Alanna Padilla 805-777-1175 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.