Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
De Crescenzo, Michael, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Faulkner, Matthew J, against Lyft, Inc., Sekhon, Jaspreet Singh, represented by Dahm, Stephen L, Juschin, Madison, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarmann, Bernard C., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Order to Show Cause
Date: August 20, 2021Notice
Date: January 14, 202252721Defen0071d1
Date: January 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2025 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E 5-7 days. Jury for both Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
January 31, 2025 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference JT = 02/03/25 T/E 5-7 days. Jury for both Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
December 11, 2023 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E 5 days. Jury for both Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
December 08, 2023 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference JT = 12/11/23 T/E 5 days Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
November 17, 2023 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference FCMC: 12/08/2023 // JT: 12/11/2023 // T/E: 5 DAYS (D-H) Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
October 27, 2023 | Hearing |
Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition Ex-Parte Application to Continue Trial and Related Discovery Deadlines Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
October 27, 2023 | Hearing |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Ex Parte 10/24/23 due 10/26/23 by noon; Def: Sekhon's Ex Parte App to Continue Trial and Related Dates; Stephen Dahm, Esq. - 650-991-5126 ext 12 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Decl2 To Continue Trial | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Order2 To Continue Trial | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | EPA2 To Continue Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.