Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Miller, Penny, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Azizi, Daniel, against Arden Garden Apartments Llc, A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarmann, Bernard C., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Order to Show Cause
Date: August 20, 2021Ruling
Date: December 02, 2021CW423287.936144.Signed Penny Miller Stipulation Final 1.4.22 (2)
Date: January 05, 2022CW420490
Date: January 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
January 20, 2022 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 cont'd from 12/03/21 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
January 20, 2022 | Hearing |
Motion for Change of Venue 11/16/21 Plaintiff, PENNY MILLER Motion for Transfer of Venue by Plaintiff Penny Miller Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Change of Venue 11/16/21 Plaintiff, PENNY MILLER Motion for Transfer of Venue by Plaintiff Penny Miller Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 cont'd from 12/03/21 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | CW420490 | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | CW423287.936144.Signed Penny Miller Stipulation Final 1.4.22 (2) | |
December 03, 2021 | Hearing | Audio streaming announced. | |
December 03, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ruling 12/02/2021 Ruling |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.