Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Adelfa Riano Hernandez, Albaro Martinez, Alejandra Velasco, Alfreda Torres Velasco, Araceli Lopez Garcia, (total of 99) See All filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Carrol, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarmann, Bernard C., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
Category15-Cv Other Employment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order to Show Cause
Date: August 18, 2021Further Case Management Conference
Date: July 13, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: July 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference 11/02/2023 Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 02/14/22, 04/19/22, 07/14/22, 11/15/22, 03/15/23, 07/13/23, 11/02/23 |
|
January 31, 2024 | Hearing |
Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 02/14/22, 04/19/22, 07/14/22, 11/15/22, 03/15/23, 07/13/23, 11/02/23 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
January 19, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Statement - defendant |
|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement - defendant |
|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024 0118 CMC Statement | |
January 12, 2024 | Hearing | Case Management Statement | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management 110 Sun Pac | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference 11/02/2023 Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 02/14/22, 04/19/22, 07/14/22, 11/15/22, 03/15/23, 07/13/23 |
|
November 02, 2023 | Hearing |
Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 02/14/22, 04/19/22, 07/14/22, 11/15/22, 03/15/23, 07/13/23 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.