Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Santiago, Juan, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Barry, David N, against Fca Us Llc, Fca Us, Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company, represented by Proudfoot, Matthew M, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarmann, Bernard C., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Order to Show Cause
Date: August 18, 2021Notice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes
Date: August 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2022 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
December 01, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
September 08, 2021 | Hearing | Demand for Jury Trial | |
September 08, 2021 | Hearing | Answer to Complaint | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury Trial | |
August 30, 2021 | Hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to FCA US, LLC, A Delaware Limited Liability Company via personal service. |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to FCA US, LLC, A Delaware Limited Liability Company via personal service. |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Notice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes and Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.110 and Notice of Case Management Conference |
|
August 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes and Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.110 and Notice of Case Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.