Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Euler Hermes North America Insurance Company, Assignee Of Pacific Shore Holding Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gaba, Rudolfo, Gaba, Rudolfo, Jr., against Absolute Tile And Natural Stones, A Corporation, Varelas, Armando, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Bradshaw, J. Eric presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBradshaw, J. Eric Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
Category09-Cv Other Collections-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Order to Show Cause
Date: August 13, 202155656_CLIENT_585_2
Date: January 10, 202255656_RGJ
Date: January 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | 55656_AOSOJ_TO_COURT | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | 55656_MOC_2 | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | 55656_WOE_2 | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | 55656_NOE_OF_JUD_TO_COURT | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | 55656_ABSTRACT_TO_COURT | |
April 27, 2022 | Hearing |
Further Case Management Conference Cont'd from 2/9/22 for counsel to resubmit corrected default judgment Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference Cont'd from 2/9/22 for counsel to resubmit corrected default judgment Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | 55656_dec_re_no_contract | |
February 09, 2022 | Hearing | Audio streaming announced. | |
February 09, 2022 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.