Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gaeta, Sandra, Sandra Gaeta, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Leifer, Deanna S., against Abraham Ayala, Ayala, Abraham, Jbbc, Inc., Jim Bailey, represented by Richardson, Lyne A, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2021 |
Category15-Cv Other Employment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order to Show Cause
Date: June 16, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: December 13, 20212022 02 04 Gaeta Sep Stmt ISO MTC RFPs [MLG]
Date: February 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023 06 30 Gaeta Pls Req for Dismissal | |
February 25, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023 02 24 Gaeta Amendment to Compl | |
September 26, 2022 | Hearing |
Jury Trial estimate 10 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
September 26, 2022 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial estimate 10 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | 62451Joint00aab3 | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Ntc of Non Opp to Mtn to Bifurcate | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | 61303Propo015755 | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | 61303Defen00e902 | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply Renewed ISO MTC SROGs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.