Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rodriguez, Angel, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Nguyen, Athena, against Fca Us Llc, Fca Us Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company, represented by Hanson, Erin E, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Order to Show Cause
Date: June 15, 20219.1.22 Rodriguez Angel v. FCA US LLC NOS
Date: September 01, 202211.16.22 Rodriguez v. GM - RFD
Date: November 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | 11.16.22 Rodriguez v. GM - RFD | |
September 06, 2022 | Hearing |
Jury Trial estimate 7 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
September 06, 2022 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial estimate 7 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | 9.1.22 Rodriguez Angel v. FCA US LLC NOS | |
December 13, 2021 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
November 24, 2021 | Hearing | Case Management Statement | |
November 12, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees | |
November 12, 2021 | Hearing | Case Management Statement | |
September 28, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.