Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Broder, Joy, Gonzalez, Karen, Ina Hollingsead, By And Through Her Successor In Interest, Joy Broder, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Arias, Mike, against Compass Senior Living, Llc., Summit Hills 85, Llc., The Eternal Bliss Limited Partnership, represented by Izu, Matthew Ken, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Bradshaw, J. Eric presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBradshaw, J. Eric Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Motion to Compel
Date: November 09, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: December 13, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: December 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference To be heard by Judge Bradshaw Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
December 13, 2021 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference To be heard by Judge Bradshaw Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel 11/09/2021 Motion to Compel 10/8/21 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel the Deposition of the Person Most Knowledgable of Defendant Summit Hills 85, LLC and for Actual Production of Documents To be heard by Judge Bradshaw Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
|
November 09, 2021 | Hearing | Audio streaming announced. | |
November 09, 2021 | Hearing |
Motion to Compel 10/8/21 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel the Deposition of the Person Most Knowledgable of Defendant Summit Hills 85, LLC and for Actual Production of Documents To be heard by Judge Bradshaw Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
|
November 02, 2021 | Hearing |
Reply to Defendant Summit Hills 85, LLC's Opposition to Motion to Compel the Person Most Knowledgeable Deposition of Defendant |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply to Defendant Summit Hills 85, LLC's Opposition to Motion to Compel the Person Most Knowledgeable Deposition of Defendant |
|
November 01, 2021 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment / Case Management Conference the above entitled matter is assigned to the Honorable J. Eric Bradshaw for all purposes. It will be managed on the direct calendar program in "J" until its conclusion. Peremptory challenges, if any, must be made within the times set forth in CCP 170.6. Please include the initials JEB after the case number on all future pleadings filed in this case. Bakersfield Hearing Locations: Departments 1 through 18 are located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue, Bakersfield, CA 93301 Divisions A through L are located at 1215 Truxtun Avenue, Bakersfield, CA 93301 TO EACH PARTY AND THEIR RESPECTIVE ATTORNEY(S) OF RECORD: This case is set for a Motion to Compel on November 09, 2021 at 8:30 AM in Department 11. This case is set for Case Management Conference by the Honorable J. Eric Bradshaw on December 13, 2021 at 8:30 AM in Department/Division 11. Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment / Case Management Conference the above entitled matter is assigned to the Honorable J. Eric Bradshaw for all purposes. It will be managed on the direct calendar program in "J" until its conclusion. Peremptory challenges, if any, must be made within the times set forth in CCP 170.6. Please include the initials JEB after the case number on all future pleadings filed in this case. Bakersfield Hearing Locations: Departments 1 through 18 are located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue, Bakersfield, CA 93301 Divisions A through L are located at 1215 Truxtun Avenue, Bakersfield, CA 93301 TO EACH PARTY AND THEIR RESPECTIVE ATTORNEY(S) OF RECORD: This case is set for a Motion to Compel on November 09, 2021 at 8:30 AM in Department 11. This case is set for Case Management Conference by the Honorable J. Eric Bradshaw on December 13, 2021 at 8:30 AM in Department/Division 11. Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.