Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Aguilar, Christina D., Aguilar, Gerardo A., Aguilar, Juan, Aguilar, Soraya, Aldaoud, Nancy, (total of 81) See All filed a(n) Construction - Torts case represented by Chodzko, Megan, against Lennar Fresno Inc. A California Corporation, Lennar Homes Of California, Inc. A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
Category10-Cv Construction Defect - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeConstruction |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order to Show Cause
Date: June 14, 20216236 Aldaoud - RFD HOs
Date: January 20, 202253222CaseM01356f
Date: February 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2023 | Hearing |
Case Status Conference continued from 08/10/2023 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Joint CMS for 12.08.23 | |
November 28, 2023 | Hearing |
Case Management Statement Joint Case Management Statement |
|
October 26, 2023 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) as to Plaintiff Ronnreika Hughes only |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | 6236 Aldaoud - RFD for Hughes | |
August 10, 2023 | Hearing |
Case Status Conference continued from 04/12/2023 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Status Conference continued from 04/12/2023 |
|
July 27, 2023 | Hearing |
Case Management Statement filed jointly |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | 79688CaseM001299 | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement filed jointly |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.