Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Granite State Insurance Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hogan, Bruce W, against Josco Construction, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Lampe, David R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLampe, David R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
Category09-Cv Other Collections-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Order to Show Cause
Date: April 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2021 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
July 15, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
April 05, 2021 | Hearing | Summons Issued and Filed | |
April 02, 2021 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice Summons: Bottom portion of summons must be blank in order for the Court to issue. Please remove the checked boxes on #3 and resubmit. |
|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Electronic Rejection Notice Summons: Bottom portion of summons must be blank in order for the Court to issue. Please remove the checked boxes on #3 and resubmit. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/15/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 11 |
|
April 01, 2021 | Hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
April 01, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/15/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 11 |
|
April 01, 2021 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice To: Bruce Hogan Re: Summons Reason: Summons do not conform to Complaint. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Electronic Rejection Notice To: Bruce Hogan Re: Summons Reason: Summons do not conform to Complaint. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.