Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Direct Capital, A Division Of Cit Bank, N.A. A Federal National Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Chow, Ronnie, against Gopal Singh, Ind. And As Guarantor, Gurparshad Truck Lines, Inc, A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarmann, Bernard C., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2021 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Order to Show Cause
Date: March 16, 2021Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: June 29, 202151455Reque00155a
Date: January 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event | 56270Reque00c5f9 | |
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event | 56270DECLA018605 | |
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event | 56270DECLA034333 | |
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event | 56270Reque0404a7 | |
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event | 56270Defau022ef4 | |
January 19, 2022 | Hearing |
Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 09/13/21, 11/17/21 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 09/13/21, 11/17/21 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | 51455Reque00155a | |
January 03, 2022 | Hearing |
Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered As to Gurparshad Truck Lines, Inc. a California corporation; Gopal Singh ind and as Guarantor on complaint filed 3/15/21 |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered As to Gurparshad Truck Lines, Inc. a California corporation; Gopal Singh ind and as Guarantor on complaint filed 3/15/21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.