Case Last Refreshed: 15 hours ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Allen, Douglas B, Kao, Bryan A, Noe, Jeffrey W, Ohanesian, John, Papageorge, Thomas A, (total of 7) See All against Brookdale Senior Living Inc., Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., A Delaware Corporation, represented by Kiepen, Scott J, Senelick, Devin M, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 14, 2021 |
Category07-Cv Business Tort - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: July 06, 2023Motion (Post-Disposition)
Date: August 30, 2023Motion (Post-Disposition)
Date: July 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Status Conference regarding Defendant's compliance with the Judgment. |
|
July 31, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Status Conference regarding Defendant's compliance with the Judgment. Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion (Post-Disposition) 07/25/2023 Motion (Post-Disposition) Continued from 07/25/2023 - THE PEOPLE S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXTEND MONITORING PERIOD AND EXPAND THE SCOPE OF MONITORING; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES |
|
August 30, 2023 | Hearing |
Motion (Post-Disposition) Continued from 07/25/2023 - THE PEOPLE S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXTEND MONITORING PERIOD AND EXPAND THE SCOPE OF MONITORING; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Regarding the People's Motion to Extend Monitoring Period and Expand the Scope of Monitoring |
|
August 09, 2023 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order Regarding the People's Motion to Extend Monitoring Period and Expand the Scope of Monitoring Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order re Motion to Extend | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion (Post-Disposition) 07/25/2023 Motion (Post-Disposition) FILED 6/28/23 THE PEOPLE S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXTEND MONITORING PERIOD AND EXPAND THE SCOPE OF MONITORING; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES |
|
July 25, 2023 | Hearing |
Motion (Post-Disposition) FILED 6/28/23 THE PEOPLE S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXTEND MONITORING PERIOD AND EXPAND THE SCOPE OF MONITORING; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response DEFENDANT S RESPONSE TO THE PEOPLE S OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXTEND MONITORING PERIOD AND EXPAND THE SCOPE OF MONITORING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.