Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Berkley National Insurance Company, Rlh Fire Protection, Inc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Letofsky, Brian S, against Rlh Fire Protection, Inc., represented by Jeffery, Mona J, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2021 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Order to Show Cause
Date: March 12, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: November 10, 2021POS.RFD.Entire
Date: March 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2022 | Hearing |
Jury Trial estimate 5 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
August 08, 2022 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial estimate 5 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY - RFD - CLIENT XC SCAN | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - CLIENT XC SCAN | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | POS.RFD.Entire | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference 11/10/2021 Case Management Conference CRC, Rule 3.1385 cont'd from 9/8/21 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
November 10, 2021 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference CRC, Rule 3.1385 cont'd from 9/8/21 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
October 19, 2021 | Hearing | Case Management Statement | |
October 18, 2021 | Hearing | Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.