Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Duarte, Virgil Marius, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2021 |
Category43-Nc Name Change - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Petition for Change of Name
Date: May 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Change of Name 05/19/2021 Petition for Change of Name 1 adult CLETS OK / NO PUB Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
May 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Proof of Publication Published in the Kern Valley Sun |
|
May 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Petition for Change of Name 1 adult CLETS OK / NO PUB Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Published in the Kern Valley Sun |
|
April 06, 2021 | Hearing |
CLETS Check Returned Cleared for hearing. |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLETS Check Returned Cleared for hearing. |
|
March 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Request for CLETS Report sent to KCSO |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for CLETS Report sent to KCSO |
|
March 18, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name to be published in the Kern Valley Sun hrg: 5/19/21 @830am dept 12 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name to be published in the Kern Valley Sun hrg: 5/19/21 @830am dept 12 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.