Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Irene Middleton, Middleton, Irene, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Geoulla, Daniel D, against Hodel, Robert D., Hodel'S Country Dining, Hodel'S Development Corporation, Robert D. Hodel, represented by Hall, Ann C, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarmann, Bernard C., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2021 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: June 25, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: September 08, 2021Order to Show Cause
Date: March 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CIV-110 Request for Dismissal | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CM-200 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT signed 2 | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER -IN RE MTC DME | |
October 03, 2022 | Hearing |
Jury Trial
Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
October 03, 2022 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
September 10, 2022 | Docket Event | PRINT Reply - MTN COMPEL IME | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | P Opp to D MTC DME | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name | |
July 16, 2022 | Docket Event | MTN Compel IME | |
July 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed order - MTN Compel IME_071522-202456 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.