Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Alarcon, Hector, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Yaghoubzadeh, Joshua E, against Nijjar Realty, Inc, Nijjar Realty, Inc. A California Corporation, Pama Management, Inc, Pama Management, Inc. A California Corporation, represented by Karamian, Ara S, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2021 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Order to Show Cause
Date: March 12, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: June 28, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: September 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2022 | Hearing |
Jury Trial estimate 10 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
October 03, 2022 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial estimate 10 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | 63722PROPO00181e | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022.09.01 - PMTQ Medical Subpoena.Complete | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022.09.01 - PMTQ DMV Subpoena.Complete | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022.09.01 - P's Sep. Statement. MTQ | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022.09.01 - P's Sep. Statement. MTQ (DMV) | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | 62819Decla01b3cc | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | 62819Motio008be4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.