Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Roberts, Cole Austin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Whitehead, Nigel A., against Estate Of Sebastian Alberto Martinez, Deceased, Perez Dowling, Mari, represented by Czeshinski, Michael J, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2021 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Order to Show Cause
Date: March 11, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: September 07, 2021Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: October 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal | |
March 25, 2022 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Cont'd from 06/24/21 10/22/21 Judge: Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S. |
|
March 25, 2022 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference Cont'd from 10/22/21 Judge: Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S. |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Cont'd from 10/22/21 |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Cont'd from 06/24/21 10/22/21 |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's CMC Statement | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Amended CMC Statement | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Roberts CMC Stmt | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 06/24/2021 Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 continued from 06/24/2021 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.