Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bear Valley Community Services District, A California Community Services District, Edmonds, David, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Kelly, Erin M., Kelly, Erin M, against Bear Valley Community Services District, Bear Valley Community Services District,A California Community Services District, represented by Quadrel, Ryan A, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2021 |
Category15-Cv Other Employment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Management Conference
Date: September 07, 2021Order to Show Cause
Date: March 09, 2021Demurrer
Date: June 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2024 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E 15 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
June 10, 2024 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
May 17, 2024 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Trial/Fcmc 6/10/24, Dept 17, T/E 15 days Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
November 27, 2023 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
November 27, 2023 | Hearing |
Jury Trial 15 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MC-040 Edmonds | |
November 02, 2023 | Hearing | Notice of Change Name/Address | |
November 02, 2023 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice RE: Notice of Change of Address REASON: Proof of service is incomplete as to item 3(b). Please review. |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | MC-040 Edmonds | |
October 19, 2023 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference DEPT 17 FCMC/TRIAL 11/27/23, T/E 15 DAYS Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.