Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Garza, Abel, filed a(n) 02-Cv Writ Of Mandate-Civil Unlimited case against Department Of Motor Vehicles, An Agency Of The State Of California, By And Through Its Director, Steven Gordon, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Bradshaw, J. Eric presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBradshaw, J. Eric Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management44 days |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2020 |
Category02-Cv Writ Of Mandate-Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial196 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
||
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2021 | Hearing |
Court Trial
Judge: Palmer - Retired, William D. |
|
January 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Ruling
Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
|
January 08, 2021 | Hearing | Ruling | |
December 15, 2020 | Hearing |
Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief |
|
December 03, 2020 | Hearing | Ruling | |
December 01, 2020 | Hearing |
Opposition Respondent DMVs' Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition Respondent DMVs' Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate |
|
November 02, 2020 | Hearing |
Brief Petitioner's Opening Brief |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.