Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Zamora, Benjamin, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Rodriguez, Connie A, against 3015 Calloway Drive Blvd., Llc, Sk Ventures, Llc, Suggs, Miyoung, Vadnais, Tonya Renee, Wiley, Jeff R., (total of 5) See All represented by Beckman, Peter W, Dodgin, Dustin S, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarmann, Bernard C., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management198 days |
Filing DateJune 24, 2019 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial854 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions515 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order to Show Cause
Date: June 25, 2019Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: June 30, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: August 14, 2020Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: August 11, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: June 09, 2020Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: August 26, 2020Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 20, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: January 05, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: November 12, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: March 11, 202073. Pltf's Prove Up Default Package and Exhibits
Date: February 23, 202272. Dec of CR in Supp of Default Judgment
Date: February 23, 2022Default
Date: January 11, 2022Case Status Conference
Date: February 24, 2022Default
Date: February 24, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: August 20, 2020Abstract of Judgment- signed
Date: August 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment- signed | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Default/ Case Status Conference 02/24/2022 Case Status Conference cont'd from 11/19/21 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Default/ Case Status Conference 02/24/2022 Default prove-up cont'd from 01/11/22 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
February 24, 2022 | Hearing | Audio streaming announced. | |
February 24, 2022 | Hearing |
Judgment for the Plaintiff against Defendants, Jeff R. Wiley, Doe 3, 3015 Calloway Dr., Blvd, LLC and Doe 21 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
February 24, 2022 | Hearing |
Default prove-up cont'd from 01/11/22 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
February 24, 2022 | Hearing |
Case Status Conference cont'd from 11/19/21 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | 73. Pltf's Prove Up Default Package and Exhibits | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | 72. Dec of CR in Supp of Default Judgment | |
February 22, 2022 | Hearing |
Declaration Plaintiff's Default Prove-Up Package with Exhibits |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.