Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Rhina Beatriz Carrillo, Individually, And On Behalf Of Others Similarly Situated, filed a(n) 42-Cv Other Complaint - Civil Unlimited case represented by Matern, Matthew J, against Kern Ridge Growers, Inc., Kern Ridge Growers, Llc, Ma Medina Farm Labor Services, Inc., represented by Borchers, Jason H, Miller, James D, Raimondo, Anthony P, Wainess, Steven R, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management181 days |
Filing DateApril 29, 2019 |
Category42-Cv Other Complaint - Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
||
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
class Kern Ridge Notice of Furt Status Rpt
Date: March 22, 2024Case Status Conference
Date: June 08, 2022Order to Show Cause
Date: May 01, 2019Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: August 14, 2019Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: June 17, 2019Case Status Conference
Date: June 21, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: October 19, 2020Case Status Conference
Date: March 22, 2023Case Status Conference
Date: September 16, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: January 20, 2021Case Status Conference
Date: October 19, 2023Case Status Conference
Date: September 08, 2021Case Status Conference
Date: June 04, 2024Ruling
Date: August 12, 2019Case Status Conference
Date: January 17, 2024Case Status Conference
Date: March 05, 2024Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: July 07, 2022Case Status Conference
Date: January 12, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 15, 2019Motion for Leave
Date: June 30, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: August 08, 2022Case Status Conference
Date: October 18, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: October 28, 201993171Statu000580
Date: March 04, 2024Carrillo (Class) Kern Ridge Pls Status Rpt
Date: February 29, 2024Class Kern Ridge Notice of Furt Status Rpt
Date: February 14, 202490137DEFEN007403
Date: January 17, 20242024 01 16 Carrillo Kern Ridge Pls Status Rpt
Date: January 17, 2024BCV-19-101197 - Defendants Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: April 20, 2022MA Medina - Kern Ridge - Class Action - Case Management Statement
Date: June 03, 20222022 06 07 Carrillo CMS re. 6.8.22 CMC
Date: June 07, 20222022 06 10 Carrillo MTC re SROGs
Date: June 11, 20222022 06 10 Carrillo Sep Stmt ISO MTC
Date: June 11, 20222021 06 10 Carrillo Decl. ISO MTC
Date: June 11, 20222022 06 10 Carillo Pl's Prop Ord re MTC.docx
Date: June 11, 202259480DEFEN000520
Date: June 24, 202259480DECLA028c5e
Date: June 24, 202259480DEFEN01817b
Date: June 24, 20222022 06 29 Carrillo Reply ISO MTC
Date: June 29, 20222021 07 08 Carrillo Decl of SA re MTC RFPs
Date: July 09, 20222022 07 08 Carrillo MTC RFP
Date: July 09, 20222022 07 08 Carrillo Pls' Sep Stmt
Date: July 09, 20222022 07 08 Carrillo POS re MTC RFPs
Date: July 09, 202260960Oppos007da9
Date: July 26, 202260960Oppos01e62f
Date: July 26, 202260960Decla02acd6
Date: July 26, 20222022 08 01 Carrillo Reply ISO MTC
Date: August 02, 202262906CaseM0005ae
Date: September 01, 202263453DEFEN00b0f9
Date: September 14, 20222022 09 14 Carrillo CMS re Kern
Date: September 15, 20222022 09 15 Carrillo Ntc of Remote Appearance
Date: September 15, 202268905NXTHR006e3d
Date: January 07, 2023Class Kern Ridge Jt Status Rpt
Date: March 11, 20232023 10 30 Carrillo Kern Ridge Ntc of Ruling
Date: October 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
June 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition) 3/11/2024 Defendant MA Medina Farm Labor Services; Motion to Quash |
|
June 11, 2024 | Hearing |
Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition) 3/11/2024 Defendant MA Medina Farm Labor Services; Motion to Quash Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
June 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Regular 3/11/24 due: 3/14/24; Def:MA Medina Farm Labor Services; Motion to Quash; contact: Kevin (559) 432-3000 |
|
June 11, 2024 | Hearing |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Regular 3/11/24 due: 3/14/24; Def:MA Medina Farm Labor Services; Motion to Quash; contact: Kevin (559) 432-3000 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Status Conference 03/05/2024 Case Status Conference continued from 03/05/2024 |
|
June 04, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Status Conference continued from 03/05/2024 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | class Kern Ridge Notice of Furt Status Rpt | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Further Case Status Conference 3/05/2024 | |
March 21, 2024 | Hearing | Notice of Further Case Status Conference 3/05/2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.