Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Consultants Real Estate, Inc., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Setschedule, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 11, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims - 1,501 To 5,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2021 | Hearing |
Small Claims Trial CHALLENGE OF CHANGE OF VENUE FILED BY DEFENDANT ON 04/01/2021 $2,946.60 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Trial CHALLENGE OF CHANGE OF VENUE FILED BY DEFENDANT ON 04/01/2021 $2,946.60 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Hearing |
Letter Received Letter From: SETSCHEDULE, LLC Date of Letter: 04/01/2021 Re: CHALLENGE FOR CHANGE OF VENUE |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Received Letter From: SETSCHEDULE, LLC Date of Letter: 04/01/2021 Re: CHALLENGE FOR CHANGE OF VENUE |
|
March 29, 2021 | Hearing |
Proof of Service As to SetSchedule, LLC |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service As to SetSchedule, LLC |
|
March 22, 2021 | Hearing |
Certified Mail Claimed As to SetSchedule LLC |
|
March 22, 2021 | Hearing |
Declaration of Non-Service As to SetSchedule LLC, Erin Upchurch |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Claimed As to SetSchedule LLC |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Non-Service As to SetSchedule LLC, Erin Upchurch |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.