Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc,, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Chrisos, Alexa A., against Santiago, Vidalia, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2020 |
Category09-Cl <10K Rule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2022 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) Cont. from 01/20/21 No disposition in 2 yrs, case to be dismissed. Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) Cont. from 01/20/21 No disposition in 2 yrs, case to be dismissed. Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
January 20, 2021 | Hearing |
To ensure the public has access to court proceedings during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court will be audio live streaming all non-confidential matters. This alternative method for observing courtroom proceedings is strongly encouraged during this time for all non-parties to avoid attending court in-person where social distancing protocols and limited courtroom access applies. It is also available because Judicial Officers may have to limit, or impose other reasonable restrictions upon, public access to their courtrooms and adjacent hallways based on recommended social distancing requirements. Each judge retains the discretion and authority to refuse, limit or terminate audio live streaming of the proceedings, or portions thereof, pursuant to the factors and prohibitions articulated in California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, and in consideration of other statutory and constitutional provisions. By Court Order and California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, audio live streams may NOT be recorded, broadcasted or rebroadcasted without prior written permission from the Court. Witnesses who have been instructed not to discuss their testimony or court proceedings with others may not listen to the audio streaming of any portion of the trial. |
|
January 20, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
To ensure the public has access to court proceedings during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court will be audio live streaming all non-confidential matters. This alternative method for observing courtroom proceedings is strongly encouraged during this time for all non-parties to avoid attending court in-person where social distancing protocols and limited courtroom access applies. It is also available because Judicial Officers may have to limit, or impose other reasonable restrictions upon, public access to their courtrooms and adjacent hallways based on recommended social distancing requirements. Each judge retains the discretion and authority to refuse, limit or terminate audio live streaming of the proceedings, or portions thereof, pursuant to the factors and prohibitions articulated in California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, and in consideration of other statutory and constitutional provisions. By Court Order and California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, audio live streams may NOT be recorded, broadcasted or rebroadcasted without prior written permission from the Court. Witnesses who have been instructed not to discuss their testimony or court proceedings with others may not listen to the audio streaming of any portion of the trial. |
|
November 16, 2020 | Hearing | Ruling | |
July 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
January 23, 2020 | Hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Vidalia Santiago via personal service. |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Vidalia Santiago via personal service. |
|
January 21, 2020 | Hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.