Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Segovia Manuel, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Yang Seung Esq., against Tifco Industries Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Holly E. Kendig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHolly E. Kendig Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 16, 2018 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time32 days |
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: July 16, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: July 16, 2018PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER
Date: July 19, 2018Minute Order -
Date: July 23, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER
Date: July 26, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 31, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 01, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: August 17, 2018Complaint
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: July 31, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 01, 2018Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 17, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.