Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kkw Trucking Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mendelson Goldman & Schwarz Apc, against Mata Robert, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Howard L. Halm presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHoward L. Halm Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 2018 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time19 days |
COMPLAINT FOR MONEY: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC
Date: July 20, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: July 20, 2018NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: July 20, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: July 24, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 24, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
Date: August 08, 2018DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE
Date: September 04, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: September 19, 2018Complaint
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: September 18, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: September 04, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: August 08, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.