Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mok Benjamin, Mok Raymond, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Curd Galindo & Smith Llp, Galindo Alexis, Law Offices Of Xipeng Huang, against Carrillo Rosa, Hacienda-La Puente Unified School Distric, represented by Dumont Louis R. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Debre Katz Weintraub presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebre Katz Weintraub Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management362 days |
Filing DateJune 28, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions285 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Declaration of Hal Longan; Filed by: Hacienda-La Puente Unified School Distric (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Raymond Mok (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Court Order; Filed by: Raymond Mok (Plaintiff); Benjamin Mok (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Hacienda-La Puente Unified School Distric (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Transfer) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Hacienda-La Puente Unified School Distric (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Complaint Filed by null
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Hacienda-La Puente Unified School Distric (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Hal Longan) Filed by Hacienda-La Puente Unified School Distric (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT TO PERSONAL INJURY COURT;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Benjamin Mok (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Benjamin Mok (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Hacienda-La Puente Unified School Distric (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Raymond Mok (Plaintiff); Benjamin Mok (Plaintiff)
Date: October 19, 2020Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Benjamin Mok (Legacy Party); Liqun Zhou (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Complaint (1st) Filed by null
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference (cf ))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Transfer) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference (Adv. from , deft's atty to ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Entry of Dismissal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: October 07, 2020Request for Dismissal Filed by Hacienda-La Puente Unified School Distric (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Raymond Mok (Plaintiff); Benjamin Mok (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Transfer)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Raymond Mok (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Complaint (2nd) Filed by null
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order) Filed by Raymond Mok (Plaintiff); Benjamin Mok (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT TO PERSONAL INJURY COURT;))
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Hal Longan)
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-09-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Notice (OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER AND MOTION)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Answer (to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Transfer))
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/30/2020)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Transfer) of 10/25/2018)
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Notice ( of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing and Order to Give Notice)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference (Adv. from 6/6/19, deft's atty to ...))
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference (cf 4/1/20)))
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Benjamin)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise))
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Benjamin)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Alexis Galindo in Support of Application for Minor's Compromise)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.