Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Moncrief Herman, Morgan Florence, filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case represented by Johnson Gregory L., Johnson Gregory L. Esq., Johnson Stephanie A. Esq., Johnson Gregory Lynn, Johnson Stephanie Ann, (total of 5) See All against Arpom Inc. Dba Camellia Gardens Care Center A California Corporation, Arpon Inc., Does 1 - 25, Camellia Gardens Care Center, represented by Murphy Robert E., Renick Steven J. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Howard L. Halm presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHoward L. Halm Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management158 days |
Filing DateMay 24, 2018 |
CategoryElder Abuse/Dependent Adult Abuse Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions196 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time602 days |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: Herman Moncrief (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Order RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Complaint for Damages; Filed by: Herman Moncrief (Petitioner); As to: Arpom, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Arpom, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Herman Moncrief (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Arpom, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Complaint for Damages; Filed by: Herman Moncrief (Petitioner); As to: Arpom, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by: Herman Moncrief (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Florence Morgan (Plaintiff); As to: Arpom, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Herman Moncrief (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by: Arpom, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Herman Moncrief (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Arpom, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Arpom, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Order permitting plaintiff leave to file second amended complaint; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Arpom, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Complaint; Filed by: Herman Moncrief (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Herman Moncrief (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint Second; Filed by: Herman Moncrief (Petitioner); As to: Arpom, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Florence Morgan (Plaintiff); As to: Arpom, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (- Civil Ex Parte)
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Complaint for Damages
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Reassignment and Order
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE CMC)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00First Amended Complaint for Damages
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Application-Miscellaneous (FOR HERMAN MONCRIEF GUARDIAN AD LITEM(COPY) )
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Application-Miscellaneous (FOR HERMAN MONCRIEF GUARDIAN AD LITEM(FAXED) )
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Notice ( of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (Rejected; Not Entered;)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Order (permitting plaintiff leave to file second amended complaint)
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) to C...))
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurr...))
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Notice ( of Continuance of Motion To Strike, Case Management Conference and Order To Show Cause)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Order (RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Complaint
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Response (To Defendant's Motion To Strike Portions of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference;))
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Settlement (of Entire Case;)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (Rejected; Not Entered;)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.