Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gaofei Investments Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Gordon Eli A., against Duran Maria, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael J. Raphael presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael J. Raphael Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 18, 2018 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Commercial (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions18 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Clerk |
Case Cycle Time38 days |
Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Document:CCP 170.6 Application Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Document:Writ of Execution filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 06, 2018Document:Partial Judgment (not entire case) Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Document:Appl for Writ of Execution & Ord Filed by: Attorney for Creditor
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Trial Setting Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Document:Writ issued Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 26, 2018Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Document:Notice of Trial Setting Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Writ of Execution
Date: August 06, 2018Complaint
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Appl for Writ of Execution & Ord
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Writ issued
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Partial Judgment (not entire case)
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.